+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (21)
On March 13, 1997 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 3/12 LEGIS RESOLVE 6
On March 7, 1997 in the Senate:
- 2:45 PM 3/7/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 6, 1997 in the House:
- NICHOLIA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RYAN, JAMES, DAVIES,
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/6/97
On March 5, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RULES FOR CALENDARING
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PORTER
On February 27, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y17 N- E3 SCR 4
- PEARCE, GREEN, LINCOLN, PHILLIPS, MILLER
- COSPONSOR(S): HALFORD, TAYLOR, LEMAN,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (ALL DEPTS/S.RLS)
- RLS RPT 3 CALENDAR AND DO PASS 2/27/97
On February 24, 1997 in the Senate:
- HES REFERRAL WAIVED
On February 21, 1997 in the Senate:
- HES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor