+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On January 24, 2014 in the House:
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
- STA REFERRAL REMOVED
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: COGHILL, MCGUIRE, DYSON
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI
- FN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE, COGHILL, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, GIESSEL, MEYER, DUNLEAVY,
- STEVENS, DYSON, KELLY, STEDMAN
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSCR 3(JUD)
On April 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor