+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 35
On April 12, 2012 in the Senate:
- 9:15 AM 4/12/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 5, 2012 in the House:
- GARDNER, FAIRCLOUGH, COSTELLO, THOMAS, GUTTENBERG, T.WILSON, PRUITT, SEATON
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK, KAWASAKI, MUNOZ, JOHNSON, HOLMES, MILLETT, KERTTULA,
- VERSION: SCR 20
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y35 E3 A2
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y34 E3 A3
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2012
On April 4, 2012 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CHENAULT
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: LYNN, AUSTERMAN, MILLER, SADDLER, THOMPSON
- MLV RPT 5DP
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER
On February 13, 2012 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): PETERSEN, LYNN
- MLV
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 20
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- MENARD, PASKVAN, HOFFMAN, DAVIS, EGAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, STEVENS
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, OLSON, COGHILL, KOOKESH, FRENCH, WAGONER, MEYER, ELLIS,
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/10/2012
On February 8, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, MEYER, GIESSEL
- STA RPT 5DP
On February 1, 2012 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (36)
Type:
Primary Sponsor