+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On August 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED IN THE (S)
On May 26, 2021 in the House:
- ENGROSSED
- RETURNED TO SENATE
On March 22, 2021 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION FAILED Y20 N17 E2 A1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN SECOND READING
On March 20, 2021 in the House:
- AM NO 6 FAILED Y14 N18 E8
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 2 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y13 N19 E8
- AM NO 4 FAILED Y15 N17 E8
- AM NO 7 FAILED Y11 N21 E8
- AM NO 8 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 9 FAILED Y15 N17 E8
- AM NO 10 FAILED Y9 N23 E8
- FAILED PASSAGE Y26 N6 E8
- VERSION: SCR 2(FLD H)
- TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 19, 2021 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 3/19 - ON 3/20 CALENDAR
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/19/2021
On March 17, 2021 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE FIRST TIME
+ − Amendments (10)
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor