+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/16 LEGIS RESOLVE 48
- 12:00 PM 6/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MILLETT, ISAACSON, COSTELLO
- VERSION: CSSCR 2(JUD)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y35 N1 E1 A3
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/18/2014
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- JUD RPT 2DP 3NR
- FN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
- DP: LYNN, KELLER
- NR: LEDOUX, FOSTER, GRUENBERG
On March 27, 2014 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/26/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSSCR 2(JUD)
- COSPONSOR(S): EGAN, COGHILL, MCGUIRE, BISHOP, GIESSEL, MEYER, STEVENS, MICCICHE,
- KELLY
- PASSED Y19 N- A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 10, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.JUD)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: COGHILL, DYSON
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor