+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (30)
On April 20, 2004 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/19 LEGIS RESOLVE 41
On April 14, 2004 in the Senate:
- 8:13 AM 4/14/04 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 6, 2004 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/6/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y35 E1 A4
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SCR 19
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On March 31, 2004 in the House:
- HES RPT 5DP
- DP: SEATON, CISSNA, WOLF, GATTO, WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(S.HES/LEG)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On March 15, 2004 in the House:
- FSH RPT 4DP 1NR
- DP: OGG, WILSON, SAMUELS, SEATON;
- NR: GUTTENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(S.HES/LEG)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On March 4, 2004 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FSH, HES
On March 3, 2004 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/3/2004
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SCR 19
On February 27, 2004 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 2DP 2NR
- DP: DYSON, WILKEN; NR: GUESS, GREEN
- FN1: ZERO(S.HES/LEG)
- FN2: ZERO(DFG)
On January 23, 2004 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES
+ − Sponsors (2)
STEVENS G BY REQUEST OF SALMON INDUSTRY TASK FORCE
Type:
Primary Sponsor