+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 25, 2012 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 33
- 11:45 AM 6/1/12 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 2, 2012 in the House:
- KERTTULA, FAIRCLOUGH, COSTELLO
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GUTTENBERG, GARA, HOLMES, JOHNSON, MILLETT, LYNN, DOOGAN,
- VERSION: SCR 18
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/2/2012
On March 15, 2012 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: JOHANSEN, GRUENBERG, SEATON, PETERSEN, KELLER
- STA RPT 5DP
On February 24, 2012 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG
On February 22, 2012 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 18
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- GIESSEL, FRENCH, ELLIS, HOFFMAN, THOMAS, STEVENS, STEDMAN
- COSPONSOR(S): OLSON, MCGUIRE, PASKVAN, MENARD, MEYER, EGAN, COGHILL, HUGGINS,
- PASSED Y16 N- E1 A3
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/22/2012
On February 10, 2012 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(S.STA)
- DP: WIELECHOWSKI, KOOKESH, PASKVAN, GIESSEL
- STA RPT 4DP
On January 18, 2012 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (26)
Type:
Primary Sponsor