+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (29)
On September 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 7/4 LEGIS RESOLVE 20
On May 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- 3:20 PM 5/7/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 6, 1995 in the House:
- KUBINA, THERRIAULT, KOTT, PARNELL
- DAVIES, HANLEY, MACLEAN, PORTER, MULDER,
- ROBINSON, ROKEBERG, AUSTERMAN, TOOHEY,
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER, NICHOLIA,
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 18
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/06/95
On May 4, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): IVAN
On May 3, 1995 in the House:
- RULES FOR CALENDARING
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIS, NAVARRE,
- GRUSSENDORF, BRICE
On May 2, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 1, 1995 in the Senate:
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- PHILLIPS, DONLEY, FRANK, ADAMS
- SALO, DUNCAN, ELLIS, LINCOLN, ZHAROFF,
- MILLER, LEMAN, SHARP, RIEGER, HALFORD,
- COSPONSOR(S): KELLY, TORGERSON, GREEN,
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 18
- ZERO FN (S.RLS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/95
On April 29, 1995 in the Senate:
- STA REFERRAL WAIVED
On April 28, 1995 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (37)
Type:
Primary Sponsor