+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (37)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 10/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 24
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 2:43 PM 5/24/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N35 E1 A1
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- AM NO 2 TABLED Y35 N3 E1 A1
- RESCIND ACTION TABLE AM 2 UC
- AM NO 2 TABLED Y33 N5 E1 A1
- PASSED Y36 N1 E1 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SCR 17
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SPOHNHOLZ, GARA, JOHNSTON, JOSEPHSON, DRUMMOND
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/12 - ON 4/13 CALENDAR
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018
- HELD TO 4/12 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH, MILLETT, ZULKOSKY, CHENAULT
On April 6, 2018 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- DP: TUCK, BIRCH, KNOPP, LEDOUX, WOOL, KREISS-TOMKINS
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On March 5, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, TUCK
On March 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/1/2018
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- COSPONSOR(S): GARDNER, COGHILL, WIELECHOWSKI, BEGICH, EGAN, WILSON, BISHOP
- COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MACKINNON, STEDMAN, MICCICHE, VON IMHOF, SHOWER, OLSON
- KELLY
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y17 N- E3
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SCR 17
On February 28, 2018 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 5DP
- DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, COGHILL, EGAN
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On February 16, 2018 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (28)
Type:
Primary Sponsor