+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (23)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 8/6 LEGIS RESOLVE 49
- 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 18, 2014 in the House:
- VERSION: SCR 17
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y35 E1 A4
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO 1ST SUP CALENDAR 4/18/2014
On April 3, 2014 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: GATTIS, KELLER, ISAACSON, KREISS-TOMKINS, HUGHES, LYNN
- STA RPT 6DP
On March 24, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On March 21, 2014 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 17
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/21/2014
On March 18, 2014 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: GIESSEL, WIELECHOWSKI, COGHILL
- STA RPT 3DP
On February 26, 2014 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor