+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (30)
On September 19, 2014 in the Senate:
- 9:25 AM 7/2 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/25 LEGIS RESOLVE 42
On April 16, 2014 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSCR 14(HSS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FEIGE, TUCK, HUGHES, JOSEPHSON
On April 2, 2014 in the House:
- HSS RPT 6DP
- DP: SEATON, PRUITT, TARR, NAGEAK, KELLER, HIGGINS
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): REINBOLD, KELLER
On March 19, 2014 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI
On March 18, 2014 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ
On March 17, 2014 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2014
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSCR 14(HSS)
On March 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT CS 3DP SAME TITLE
- DP: STEDMAN, MICCICHE, KELLY
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
On February 7, 2014 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
- COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor