+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (34)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 10/8 LEGIS RESOLVE 23
On June 27, 2018 in the Senate:
- 3:04 PM 5/30/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 13, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TILTON, TARR, ZULKOSKY, STUTES
- VERSION: SCR 14
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y39 E1
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 12, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/12 - ON 4/13 CALENDAR
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BIRCH, CHENAULT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2018
- HELD TO 4/12 CALENDAR
On March 15, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOPP
On February 21, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RAUSCHER
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: RAUSCHER, REINBOLD, PARISH, TUCK
- MLV RPT 4DP
On February 2, 2018 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SADDLER, LEDOUX
On January 31, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOHNSON, MILLETT, KAWASAKI, TUCK
- MLV
On January 29, 2018 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 14
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- HOFFMAN, GARDNER, EGAN, HUGHES, BEGICH, COGHILL, MEYER, WILSON, KELLY
- COSPONSOR(S): MACKINNON, GIESSEL, BISHOP, STEDMAN, STEVENS, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
- PASSED Y18 N- A1 V1
- BEFORE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/29/2018
On January 24, 2018 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: MEYER, WILSON, GIESSEL, EGAN, COGHILL
- STA RPT 5DP
On January 18, 2018 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): WIELECHOWSKI
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (32)
Type:
Primary Sponsor