+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (21)
On May 28, 2020 in the House:
- RECESSED 3/29/20 - 5/17/20
On May 18, 2020 in the Senate:
- 1:40 P.M. 4/1/20 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/3 LEGIS RESOLVE 22
On May 17, 2020 in the Senate:
- RECESSED 3/29/20 - 5/17/20
On March 28, 2020 in the House:
- RECESS AUTHORIZATION
On March 26, 2020 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSCR 14(RLS)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y36 E4
- TAKEN UP ON FINAL PASSAGE
On March 23, 2020 in the Senate:
- DP: COGHILL, BEGICH, GIESSEL, VON IMHOF, HOFFMAN
- TAKEN UP UC
- RLS REFERRAL ADDED UC
- RLS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULES 23 & 24B
- RLS RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
- VERSION: CSSCR 14(RLS)
- TAKEN UP UC
- RLS CS ADOPTED UC
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 23, 2020 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME
On March 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - HELD ON SECY'S DESK
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor