+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (25)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 11:27AM 7/28/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- PERMANENTLY FILED 7/31 LEGIS RESOLVE 31
On May 21, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/20/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SCR 13
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGG
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT 5DP
- DP: SEATON, HOLM, LYNN, GRUENBERG,
- WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA
On May 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/18/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SCR 13
On May 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: STEVENS G, DYSON, GUESS, COWDERY
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
On May 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA