+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (47)
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- KOOKESH
On July 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 6/1 LEGIS RESOLVE 76
On July 15, 1998 in the House:
- (H) MEMBERS: BUNDE, COCHAIR; RYAN,
On July 15, 1998 in the Senate:
- (S) MEMBERS: WILKEN, COCHAIR; SHARP,
- HOFFMAN
On July 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- PUBLIC MEMBERS ALSO APPOINTED
On May 29, 1998 in the Senate:
- 8:40 AM 5/29/98 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 12, 1998 in the House:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 11, 1998 in the House:
- RULES TO 1ST SUPPLEMENTAL CAL 5/11/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- PASSED Y36 N3 A1
- KOTT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BRICE, CROFT
On May 6, 1998 in the House:
- FIN RPT 2DP 1DNP 4NR
- DP: DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF; DNP: KOHRING;
- NR: THERRIAULT, MULDER, MARTIN, DAVIS
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 3/4/98
- 2 SENATE ZERO FNS (DCED, GOV) 3/4/98
On April 29, 1998 in the House:
- HES RPT 6DP
- DP: DYSON, GREEN, BUNDE, PORTER,
- KEMPLEN, BRICE
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 3/4/98
- 2 SEN ZERO FNS (DCED, GOV) 3/4/98
On March 23, 1998 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, FINANCE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): HUDSON
On March 20, 1998 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/98
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): ADAMS, ELLIS, HOFFMAN
- KELLY, TAYLOR, WILKEN, TORGERSON,
- MACKIE, GREEN
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 19, 1998 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- DP: SHARP, PHILLIPS, ADAMS
- NR: PARNELL, DONLEY
- PREVIOUS FN (LAA)
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (GOV, DCED)
On March 10, 1998 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: WARD
On March 4, 1998 in the Senate:
- HES RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
- DP: WILKEN, LEMAN, WARD, GREEN
- FN TO SCR & CS (LAA)
- ZERO FNS TO SCR & CS (DCED, GOV)
On April 11, 1997 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- HES, FIN
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor