+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (23)
On September 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 8/7 LEGIS RESOLVE 14
On April 7, 1995 in the Senate:
- 1:55 PM 4/7/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 5, 1995 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KUBINA, DAVIES, JAMES
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- PASSED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 10
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/05/95
On March 29, 1995 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (LAA) 3/15/95
- DP: JAMES, GREEN, ROBINSON, WILLIS, OGAN
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BUNDE, NAVARRE
- STATE AFFAIRS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUSSENDORF
On March 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- COSPONSOR: RIEGER
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 10
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/95
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FN (LAA)
- STA RPT 4DP
On March 8, 1995 in the Senate:
- STATE AFFAIRS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor