+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (26)
On July 10, 1997 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 5/21 LEGIS RESOLVE 35
- 1:50 PM 5/20/97 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 13, 1997 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
On May 11, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KELLY
- PASSED Y36 N1 A3
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO SUPP CALENDAR 5/11/97
On May 7, 1997 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.RES) 4/25/97
- HUDSON; NR: MASEK
- DP: WILLIAMS, OGAN, NICHOLIA, JOULE,
- RES RPT 5DP 1NR
On May 2, 1997 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): NICHOLIA
On April 30, 1997 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- RESOURCES
On April 28, 1997 in the Senate:
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y17 N- E1 A2 SCR 10
- COSPONSOR(S): MACKIE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/28/97
On April 25, 1997 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: LEMAN
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.RES)
- TAYLOR, SHARP
- DP: HALFORD, LEMAN, LINCOLN, GREEN,
- RES RPT 6DP
On April 9, 1997 in the Senate:
- RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (12)
Type:
Primary Sponsor