+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (27)
On March 11, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ BY GOVERNOR 3/10 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
On February 24, 1993 in the Senate:
- 10:30 AM 2/23/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 19, 1993 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/19/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 1
- PASSED Y34 N- E6
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MENARD, HANLEY
On February 17, 1993 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- DP: VEZEY, ULMER, OLBERG, G.DAVIS
- DP: SANDERS, KOTT
- -PREVIOUS ZERO FN (S.STA) 2/3/93
On February 10, 1993 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): G.PHILLIPS, THERRIAULT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILLIS, NAVARRE, ULMER
On February 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/8/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME SCR 1
- COSPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, RIEGER, PEARCE,
- DUNCAN, TAYLOR, MILLER, SALO, SHARP,
- ZHAROFF, DONLEY, FRANK, KELLY,
- LINCOLN, ELLIS
- PASSED Y18 N- A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On February 3, 1993 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA)
On January 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- STATE AFFAIRS
+ − Sponsors (21)
Type:
Primary Sponsor