+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 16, 2009 in the Senate:
- PERMANENTLY FILED 4/15 LEGIS RESOLVE 2
On March 11, 2009 in the Senate:
- 12:03 PM 3/11/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 9, 2009 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRUENBERG, JOHNSON, DAHLSTROM
- VERSION: SCR 1
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED Y32 E6 A2
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/9/2009
On March 5, 2009 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: COGHILL, SEATON, LYNN, CISSNA, KELLER
- HSS RPT 5DP
On February 27, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA
On February 25, 2009 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SCR 1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- BEFORE THE SENATE ON FINAL PASSAGE
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/25/2009
On February 13, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- DP: DAVIS, ELLIS, PASKVAN
- HSS RPT 3DP
On January 21, 2009 in the Senate:
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS