+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (13)
On March 4, 2016 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT CS 3DP NEW TITLE
- DP: COSTELLO, GIESSEL, MEYER
- FN2: (CED)
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On March 2, 2016 in the Senate:
- L&C WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
On February 24, 2016 in the Senate:
- L&C WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE,RULE 23
On February 3, 2016 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT CS 1DP 3NR NEW TITLE
- DP: GIESSEL
- NR: STEDMAN, ELLIS, STOLTZE
- FN1: (CED)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
On April 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, L&C
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor