+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (52)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 10:55AM 6/16/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/18 CHAPTER 119 SLA 03
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- VERSION: CSSB 98(TRA)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
- BERKOWITZ NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y32 E3 A5
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 98(TRA)
On May 14, 2003 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2003
On May 13, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 4DP 2NR
- NR: GARA, GRUENBERG
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: SAMUELS, HOLM, OGG, MCGUIRE;
On May 5, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 2, 2003 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 98(TRA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N5 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On May 1, 2003 in the Senate:
- MOTIONS TO ABSTAIN FROM VOTING
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 98(TRA)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- TAYLOR NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- CHAIR DENIED MOTIONS
- RULING OF CHAIR CHALLENGED
- RULING OF CHAIR UPHELD Y16 N3 E1
- PASSED Y14 N5 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 30, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/1 CALENDAR
- TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/2003
On April 25, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS(TRA) 2DP 1NR
- DP: SEEKINS, OGAN; NR: FRENCH
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
On April 9, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: LINCOLN, THERRIAULT
- DP: COWDERY, OLSON, WAGONER;
- TRA RPT CS 3DP 2NR NEW TITLE
On March 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- COWDERY, OGAN
- COSPONSOR(S): WILKEN, SEEKINS,
On March 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS