+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (38)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 12/26/18
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 9/27 CH 109 SLA 18
- 3:18 PM 9/4/18 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 30, 2018 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
On April 28, 2018 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS SB 97(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UC
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y36 E4
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS SB 97(FIN) AM H
On April 27, 2018 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/27 - ON 4/28 CALENDAR
On April 26, 2018 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/27 CALENDAR
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/26/2018
On April 11, 2018 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 8DP 2NR
- DP: GARA, PRUITT, ORTIZ, THOMPSON, GUTTENBERG, GRENN, SEATON, FOSTER
- NR: WILSON, TILTON
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On April 8, 2017 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 97
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y20 N-
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- HELD IN THIRD READING
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 97
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/5/2017
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/6 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
- FIN RPT 5DP 2NR
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- PRIME SPONSOR CHANGED: SENATE FINANCE COMMITTEE REPLACED MACKINNON
On March 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor