+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (52)
On August 5, 2009 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 10:35 AM 6/11/09 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/20 CHAPTER 45 SLA 09
On April 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- A1 V1
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 17, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 7DP
- DP: THOMAS, AUSTERMAN, GARA, FAIRCLOUGH, SALMON, JOULE, HAWKER
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2009
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 96(FIN)
- PASSED Y40
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 96(FIN)
On April 14, 2009 in the House:
- DP: COGHILL, RAMRAS
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 2DP 3NR 2AM
- AM: GRUENBERG, HOLMES
- NR: LYNN, DAHLSTROM, GATTO
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
On April 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 96(FIN)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/2009
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
On April 10, 2009 in the House:
- JUD, FIN
On April 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y19 N- V1
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 96(FIN)
On April 10, 2009 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 10, 2009 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 9, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: STEDMAN, OLSON
- DP: HOFFMAN, HUGGINS, THOMAS, ELLIS
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 2NR NEW TITLE
On March 18, 2009 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS(HSS) 1DP 3NR
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- DP: FRENCH
- NR: THERRIAULT, WIELECHOWSKI, MCGUIRE
On March 3, 2009 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(REV)
- NR: THOMAS, ELLIS
- DP: DAVIS, PASKVAN
- HSS RPT CS 2DP 2NR NEW TITLE
On February 4, 2009 in the Senate:
- HSS, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
HEALTH & SOCIAL SERVICES
Type:
Primary Sponsor