+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On June 24, 2011 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/6/11
- 12:10 PM 5/23/11 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/8 CHAPTER 18 SLA 11
On April 17, 2011 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 16, 2011 in the House:
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- FIN RPT 11DP
- DP: GUTTENBERG, GARA, FAIRCLOUGH, T.WILSON, JOULE, NEUMAN, COSTELLO, EDGMON,
- DOOGAN, STOLTZE, THOMAS
- FN2: ZERO(S.FIN/DOT)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/16/2011
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 17
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 95 AM H
- PASSED Y37 A3
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GARA, T.WILSON, GUTTENBERG, STOLTZE, FAIRCLOUGH, THOMAS,
- JOHANSEN, KERTTULA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SB 95 AM H
On April 15, 2011 in the House:
- TRA RPT 5DP
- DP: PRUITT, GRUENBERG, JOHNSON, PETERSEN, P.WILSON
- FN2: ZERO(S.FIN/DOT)
On April 14, 2011 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, FIN
On April 13, 2011 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, STEDMAN, THOMAS, EGAN, MCGUIRE, ELLIS
- NR: OLSON
- FN2: ZERO(S.FIN/DOT)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2011
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 95
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, COGHILL
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 95
On March 25, 2011 in the Senate:
- FN1: (DOT)
- DP: KOOKESH, HUGGINS, MENARD, EGAN
- TRA RPT 4DP
On March 21, 2011 in the Senate:
- TRA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On March 7, 2011 in the Senate:
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (11)
Type:
Primary Sponsor