+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (39)
On November 7, 2018 in the Senate:
- DHS ALASKA OPIOID RESPONSE REPORT RECEIVED
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 3/21 CHAPTER 1 SLA 17
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- PASSED Y39 E1
- DP: JOHNSTON, TARR, SULLIVAN-LEONARD, KITO, EASTMAN, SPOHNHOLZ
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/20/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 91(HSS)
- HSS RPT 6DP
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: CSSB 91(HSS)
- TUCK NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- 1:54 PM 3/20/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On March 20, 2017 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y39 E1
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UC
On March 17, 2017 in the House:
- HSS WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23(A) UC
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 16, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
- DP: WILSON, VON IMHOF, BEGICH, GIESSEL, MICCICHE
- FN2: ZERO(DHS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/16/2017
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- HSS CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 91(HSS)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 91(HSS)
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- HSS
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor