+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (45)
On May 5, 1993 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/3/93
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/5 CHAPTER 11 SLA 93
On April 20, 1993 in the Senate:
- 11:00 AM 4/20/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 16, 1993 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N2
On April 15, 1993 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- ..SB 90 AM H
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 N1 E1 A2
- AM NO 4 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AMENDMENT NO 4 BY HUDSON
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 4 UNAN CONSENT
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 14, 1993 in the House:
- AMENDMENT NO 2 BY DAVIDSON
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AMENDMENT NO 1 BY DAVIDSON
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y11 N26 E3
- PHILLIPS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y9 N28 E3
- AMENDMENT NO 3 NOT OFFERED
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 90
- PASSED Y24 N9 E3 A4
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/93
On March 26, 1993 in the House:
- RES REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 24, 1993 in the House:
- -PREVIOUS SEN ZERO FNS(DEC, DMVA)2/17/93
- NR: OLBERG
- DP: SANDERS, KOTT
- DP: VEZEY, ULMER, B.DAVIS, G.DAVIS
- STA RPT 6DP 1NR
On March 10, 1993 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On March 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- RULES RPT 3CAL 1NR 3/8/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 90
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 WITHDRAWN
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y18 N1 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On February 25, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FNS (DMVA, DEC)
- RES RPT 3DP 2NR
On February 17, 1993 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTES (DMVA, DEC)
- O&G RPT 3DP
On February 5, 1993 in the Senate:
- OIL & GAS, RESOURCES
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor