+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (44)
On May 12, 2005 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/10/05
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/12 CHAPTER 17 SLA 05
On May 2, 2005 in the Senate:
- 9:37 AM 5/2/05 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 22, 2005 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/22/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 90(STA)
- PASSED Y34 E2 A4
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ALL MEMBERS
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 90(STA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, STOLTZE, ROKEBERG, CHENAULT, THOMAS,
- JOULE, SAMUELS, NEUMAN, HARRIS, ANDERSON, BERKOWITZ, CISSNA, COGHILL, CRAWFORD,
- CROFT, FOSTER, GARA, GARDNER, GATTO, GRUENBERG, GUTTENBERG, HAWKER,
- HOLM, KAPSNER, KELLY, KERTTULA, KOHRING, KOTT, LEDOUX, MCGUIRE, MEYER, MOSES,
- OLSON, RAMRAS, SALMON, SEATON, WEYHRAUCH, WILSON
On April 18, 2005 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ELKINS
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/ALL DEPTS)
- DP: GARDNER, LYNN, GRUENBERG, ELKINS, SEATON
- STA RPT 5DP
On March 18, 2005 in the House:
- MLV RPT 4DP
- DP: THOMAS, GRUENBERG, ELKINS, LYNN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAHLSTROM
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/ALL DEPTS)
On February 24, 2005 in the House:
- MLV, STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 23, 2005 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/23/2005
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADOPTED STA LETTER OF INTENT UNAN CONSENT
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 90(STA)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH, WAGONER
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 90(STA)
On February 18, 2005 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV/ALL DEPTS)
- DP: THERRIAULT, ELTON, WAGONER, HUGGINS
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH STA REPORT
- STA RPT CS 4DP SAME TITLE
On February 7, 2005 in the Senate:
- THERRIAULT, DAVIS, ELLIS, KOOKESH, STEDMAN, STEVENS B, HOFFMAN, WILKEN
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON, SEEKINS, ELTON, STEVENS G, OLSON, BUNDE, COWDERY,
On February 4, 2005 in the Senate:
- STA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (55)
Type:
Primary Sponsor