+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (46)
On May 14, 1999 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/99
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/14 CHAPTER 22 SLA 99
On May 4, 1999 in the Senate:
- 3:45 PM 5/4/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 30, 1999 in the House:
- MASEK, KEMPLEN, MULDER, ROKEBERG, CISSNA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SMALLEY, HARRIS,
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y39 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(HES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/30/99
On April 29, 1999 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CROFT
On April 28, 1999 in the House:
- DP: THERRIAULT, MULDER, AUSTERMAN,
- FIN RPT 10DP
- SENATE FISCAL NOTE (ADM) 3/10/99
- DAVIES, GRUSSENDORF, DAVIS, WILLIAMS,
- FOSTER, BUNDE, KOHRING
On April 27, 1999 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DAVIES
On April 13, 1999 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): BRICE
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/99
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HES CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, PETE KELLY,
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(HES)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- TIM KELLY, PHILLIPS, DONLEY, MACKIE
On March 31, 1999 in the Senate:
- DP: TORGERSON, PARNELL, PHILLIPS, GREEN,
- FIN RPT CS(HES) 7DP 2NR
- PETE KELLY, ADAMS, WILKEN;
- NR: LEMAN, DONLEY
- PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
On March 30, 1999 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS FISCAL NOTE TO CS (ADM)
On March 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- NR: PETE KELLY; DP: WILKEN, ELTON
- HES RPT CS 2DP 1NR NEW TITLE
On March 10, 1999 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE (ADM)
- DP: MACKIE, TIM KELLY; NR: DONLEY, LEMAN
- L&C RPT 2DP 2NR
On January 19, 1999 in the Senate:
- L&C, HES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- PREFILE RELEASED - 1/8/99
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor