+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (41)
On July 20, 2001 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 3:10 PM 6/20/01 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/25 CHAPTER 46 SLA 01
On May 1, 2001 in the House:
- PASSED Y33 E2 A5
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(L&C)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/1/01
- ADOPTED FINANCE LETTER OF INTENT UC
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 9(L&C)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On February 23, 2001 in the House:
- FN2: (H.FIN/CED)
- LETTER OF INTENT WITH FIN REPORT
- LANCASTER, HUDSON, WILLIAMS; NR: MULDER
- DP: BUNDE, WHITAKER, CROFT, DAVIES,
- FIN RPT 7DP 1NR
On February 7, 2001 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On February 5, 2001 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/5/01
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- VERSION: CSSB 9(L&C)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(L&C)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On February 2, 2001 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- OLSON, WARD, WILKEN, LEMAN
- NR: DONLEY; DP: KELLY, GREEN, HOFFMAN,
- FIN RPT CS(L&C) 7DP 1NR
On January 24, 2001 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER L&C
- FN1: (CED)
- AUSTERMAN, DAVIS
- DP: PHILLIPS, LEMAN, TORGERSON,
- L&C RPT CS 5DP NEW TITLE
On January 8, 2001 in the Senate:
- L&C
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED - 12/29/00
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor