+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (93)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN8: (CED)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/16 CHAPTER 8 SLA 22
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 9:30 A.M. 6/15/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN6: (AJS)
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
On May 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N1 A2
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On May 15, 2022 in the House:
- AM NO 5 FAILED Y15 N22 A3
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y3 N30 E3 A4
- BEFORE HOUSE IN SECOND READING
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y3 N34 A3
- AM NO 4 NOT OFFERED
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N32 A3
- AM NO 6 ADOPTED Y20 N17 A3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 9(FIN) AM H
- PASSED Y35 N2 A3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) ADOPTED Y35 A5
- COURT RULE(S) ADOPTED Y36 A4
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TUCK
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 9(FIN) AM H
On May 14, 2022 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2022
- SESSION CANCELED 5/13 - ON 5/14 CALENDAR
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 2, 2022 in the House:
- FN10: ZERO(DHS)
- FN9: ZERO(CED)
- FN8: (CED)
- FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN6: (AJS)
- NR: LEBON, CARPENTER, THOMPSON, WOOL
- DP: JOSEPHSON, MERRICK
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 2DP 4NR
On February 22, 2022 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) 7DP
- FN6: (AJS)
- DP: KAUFMAN, SCHRAGE, MCCARTY, NELSON, SNYDER, FIELDS, SPOHNHOLZ
- FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN10: ZERO(DHS)
- FN8: (CED)
- FN9: ZERO(CED)
On February 9, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On February 8, 2022 in the Senate:
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 9(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM NO 1 UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- MOTION TO WITHDRAW AM NO 1 Y10 N8 E2
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 9(FIN)
- PASSED Y18 N- E2
On February 4, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN7: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FIN RPT CS 2DP 1NR 2AM SAME TITLE
- DP: BISHOP, WIELECHOWSKI
- NR: STEDMAN
- AM: WILSON, OLSON
- FN6: (AJS)
- FN8: (CED)
- FN10: ZERO(DHS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 2/4/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 2/8 CALENDAR
- FN9: ZERO(CED)
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- AM: KIEHL
- JUD RPT CS 2DP 2NR 1AM SAME TITLE
- DP: REINBOLD, MYERS
- NR: SHOWER, HUGHES
- FN1: (AJS)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN3: (CED)
- FN4: ZERO(DHS)
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV)
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN5: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- FN4: ZERO(DHS)
- FN3: (CED)
- FN2: ZERO(CED)
- FN1: (AJS)
- NR: STEVENS
- DP: COSTELLO, GRAY-JACKSON, REVAK
- L&C RPT 3DP 1NR
On January 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- L&C, JUD, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/8/21
+ − Amendments (6)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor