+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (69)
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 5/24 CH 5 SLA 19
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 5/25/19
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 5:55 P.M. 5/1/19 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 24, 2019 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- FCC RPT ADPTD Y33 N7 FCCS SB 89
- FCC REPORT: FCCS SB 89 RECEIVED 4/22/19 3:03 P.M.
- FCC REPORT READ AND TAKEN UP
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
- RECEDE MESSAGE READ AND HELD
- RECEDE MESSAGE TAKEN UP UC
- FAILED RECEDE (H) AM N39 E1
- WAIVE UNIFORM RULE 42(A) Y38 N1 E1
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
On April 22, 2019 in the House:
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
- CLAMAN (CHAIR), TUCK, PRUITT
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- FCC REPORT: FCCS SB 89 RECEIVED 4/22/19 3:01 P.M.
- UNIFORM RULE 42 (B) WAIVED UC
- FCC RPT ADPTD Y16 N3 A1 FCCS SB 89
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- FAILED CONCUR (H) AM Y- N20
- CONCUR TAKEN UP UC
- COGHILL (CHAIR), STEVENS, BEGICH
- UNIFORM RULE 42 (A) WAIVED UC
- FREE CONFERENCE GRANTED
- FREE CONFERENCE COMMITTEE APPOINTED
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- HELD TO SECRETARY'S DESK UC
- NOT TAKEN UP 4/12
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y16 N3 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RESCIND ACTION ON CONCURRENCE UC
- CONCUR VOTE HELD TO 4/12/19 UC
On April 8, 2019 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 3DP 1DNP 1AM
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- DP: STUTES, KOPP, CLAMAN
- DNP: EASTMAN
- AM: WOOL
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/8/2019
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y14 N23 E3
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 89(JUD)
- PASSED Y33 N4 E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 89(JUD)
On March 29, 2019 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/27/2019
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y2 N17 E1
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- AM NO 3 FAILED Y5 N14 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 89(JUD)
- PASSED Y15 N4 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 89(JUD)
On March 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LEG)
- AM: KIEHL
- NR: REINBOLD, MICCICHE, SHOWER
- DP: HUGHES
- JUD RPT CS 1DP 3NR 1AM SAME TITLE
On March 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES
Type:
Primary Sponsor