+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (73)
On May 14, 2024 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2024
- MOVED TO BOTTOM OF CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- L&C HCS ADOPTED UC
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 18
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y30 N10
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING SAME DAY Y36 N3 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 89(L&C) AM H
- PASSED Y32 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- C.JOHNSON NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON SAME DAY UC - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y32 N8
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, MINA
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 89(L&C) AM H
On May 11, 2024 in the House:
- FIN REFERRAL REMOVED
On May 8, 2024 in the House:
- L&C RPT HCS(L&C) NEW TITLE 3DP 3NR 1AM
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 18
- DP: CARRICK, FIELDS, PRAX
- NR: SADDLER, RUFFRIDGE, SUMNER
- AM: WRIGHT
- FN10: ZERO(ADM)
- FN11: ZERO(ADM)
- FN12: ZERO(CED)
- FN13: ZERO(DOH)
- FN14: ZERO(AJS)
- FN15: ZERO(LAW)
- FN16: ZERO(DPS)
On January 16, 2024 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
On May 16, 2023 in the Senate:
- PASSED Y14 N6
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 89(FIN)
On May 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 89(FIN)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMDS UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N15
- AM NO 2 FAILED Y5 N15
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 5/16 CAL
On May 14, 2023 in the Senate:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/14 - ON 5/15 CAL
On May 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 3DP 2NR 1AM NEW TITLE
- DP: OLSON, KIEHL, BISHOP
- NR: STEDMAN, MERRICK
- AM: WILSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(DOH)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: ZERO(LAW)
- FN8: (REV)
- FN9: ZERO(AJS)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/23
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/14 CAL
On April 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- L&C RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
- DP: BJORKMAN, DUNBAR, BISHOP, GRAY-JACKSON
- FN1: ZERO(CED)
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- FN3: ZERO(ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(DOH)
- FN5: (REV)
- FN6: ZERO(DPS)
- FN7: ZERO(LAW)
On March 1, 2023 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- L&C, FIN
- COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, GRAY-JACKSON, KIEHL, TOBIN
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (3)
STEVENS
Type:
Primary Sponsor