+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On October 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/10 CHAPTER 22 SLA 17
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 2:50 PM 7/31/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 10, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SULLIVAN-LEONARD, SADDLER
- VERSION: CSSB 88(RES)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y38 N1 E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 88(RES)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/10/2017
On April 26, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): ORTIZ
On April 19, 2017 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GRENN, THOMPSON, KAWASAKI, PRUITT
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: GUTTENBERG, GARA
- DP: TILTON, GRENN, THOMPSON, ORTIZ, PRUITT, WILSON, SEATON, FOSTER
- FIN RPT 8DP 2NR
On April 14, 2017 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2017
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RES CS ADOPTED UC
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 88(RES)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- COSPONSOR(S): STEVENS, COSTELLO, BISHOP, HUGHES, EGAN, MEYER, KELLY
- VERSION: CSSB 88(RES)
On April 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(RES) 5DP 1NR
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, MICCICHE
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- COSPONSOR(S): MICCICHE
On April 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): VON IMHOF, GIESSEL
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(DNR)
- NR: WIELECHOWSKI, MEYER
- DP: GIESSEL, HUGHES, COGHILL, STEDMAN
- RES RPT CS 4DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (18)
Type:
Primary Sponsor