+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (57)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- 1:30 PM 6/9/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/13 CHAPTER 90 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 9/11/03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 85(JUD)
- PASSED Y36 E3 A1
- ROKEBERG NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 E3 A1
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, GARA, MCGUIRE,
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 85(JUD)
On May 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y19 N- A1
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 23
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- WILSON
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) NT 7DP
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 23
- DP: SAMUELS, HOLM, GARA, OGG,
- GRUENBERG, ANDERSON, MCGUIRE
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN4: ZERO(COR)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGG, SAMUELS
On May 15, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- JUD
On May 14, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/14/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- STA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 85(STA)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- COSPONSOR(S): COWDERY
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 85(STA)
On May 8, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(STA) 7DP
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN,
- OLSON, BUNDE, STEVENS B
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: INDETERMINATE(ADM)
- FN4: INDETERIMINATE(COR)
On May 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS(STA) 3DP 2NR
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, ELLIS;
- NR: THERRIAULT, OGAN
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
- FIN REFERRAL ADDED AFTER JUD
On April 11, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT CS 5DP SAME TITLE
- DP: STEVENS G, DYSON, GUESS,
- COWDERY, HOFFMAN
- FN1: ZERO(COR)
- FN2: ZERO(LAW)
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- STA, JUD
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor