+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (37)
On June 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/27/13
- 1:30 PM 5/22/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/29 CHAPTER 22 SLA 13
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 85(TRA)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/12/2013
- PASSED Y38 E2
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: CSSB 85(TRA)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAWASAKI, TUCK, ISAACSON, KELLER, PRUITT
On April 11, 2013 in the House:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- AM: KAWASAKI
- DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, EDGMON, THOMPSON, T.WILSON, COSTELLO, STOLTZE, AUSTERMAN
- FIN RPT 8DP 1AM
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 85(TRA)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/9/2013
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- TRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- COSPONSOR(S): MCGUIRE, DYSON, MICCICHE, ELLIS, COGHILL,
- EGAN, MEYER, HOFFMAN, GARDNER, KELLY
- PASSED Y20 N-
- VERSION: CSSB 85(TRA)
On April 9, 2013 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: OLSON
- DP: KELLY, MEYER, BISHOP, FAIRCLOUGH, DUNLEAVY, HOFFMAN
- FIN RPT CS(TRA) 6DP 1NR
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: FAIRCLOUGH
- DP: EGAN, FRENCH, BISHOP
- TRA RPT CS 3DP 1NR SAME TITLE
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- TRA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor