+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (55)
On July 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 7/1/93
- 1:05 AM 5/20/93 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/3 CHAPTER 50 SLA 93
On May 8, 1993 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/8/93
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 84 AM
- PASSED Y33 N3 A4
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- BRICE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 N2
- EFFECTIVE DATE VOTE SAME AS PASSAGE
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MULDER
On April 24, 1993 in the House:
- FIN RPT 7DP 4NR
- DP: MACLEAN, LARSON, GRUSSENDORF, MARTIN
- DP: HOFFMAN, NAVARRE, FOSTER
- NR: HANLEY, PARNELL, BROWN, THERRIAULT
- -PREVIOUS FN (DPS) 4/20/93
On April 20, 1993 in the House:
- -FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 4/20/93
- NR: DAVIDSON
- DP: GREEN, KOTT, PORTER, PHILLIPS
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
On April 2, 1993 in the House:
- JUDICIARY, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y19 N1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 31, 1993 in the Senate:
- ADAMS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- EFFECTIVE DATE SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y12 N8
- RETURN TO 2ND FOR AM 2 Y11 N9
On March 29, 1993 in the Senate:
- HELD IN THIRD READING TO 3/31 CALENDAR
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 84 AM
On March 25, 1993 in the Senate:
- RULES RPT 3 CAL 1 OTHER REC 3/25/93
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 OFFERED
- TECH AM TO AM 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED Y9 N8 E1 A2
- ADVANCE TO 3RD READING FLD Y9 N8 E1 A2
- THIRD READING 3/29 CALENDAR
On March 22, 1993 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE (S.FIN/DPS)
- FIN RPT 6DP 1NR
On March 12, 1993 in the Senate:
- FISCAL NOTE (DPS)
On March 8, 1993 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (S.STA)
- JUD RPT 4DP 1NR
On February 19, 1993 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (S.STA)
- STA RPT 3DP 2NR
On February 10, 1993 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR: SALO
On February 1, 1993 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor