+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (53)
On May 3, 1996 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/3 CHAPTER 20 SLA 96
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/1/96
On April 16, 1996 in the Senate:
- 2:20 PM 4/16/96 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On February 13, 1996 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y12 N8
On February 7, 1996 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JAMES
On January 31, 1996 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 1/31/96
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 84(FIN)
- PASSED Y24 N15 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On January 30, 1996 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): TOOHEY
On January 24, 1996 in the House:
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 7DP 2NR
- TECHNICAL TITLE CHANGE
- DP: HANLEY, MULDER, KOHRING, MARTIN,
- KELLY, THERRIAULT, FOSTER
- NR: NAVARRE, GRUSSENDORF
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (H.FIN/REV)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KOHRING
On January 16, 1996 in the House:
- RETURNED TO FINANCE
On May 6, 1995 in the House:
- FIN RPT 2DP 1DNP 7NR
- DP: KELLY, MARTIN
- DNP: BROWN
- NR: FOSTER, HANLEY, KOHRING, PARNELL
- NR: NAVARRE, MULDER, THERRIAULT
- AM: GRUSSENDORF
On March 20, 1995 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MARTIN
On March 17, 1995 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y12 N6 E2
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y18 N- E2
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 16, 1995 in the Senate:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 3/17 CALENDAR
On March 15, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- COSPONSOR(S): TAYLOR, KELLY, TORGERSON
- COSPONSOR: LEMAN
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y7 N12 E1
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 84(FIN)
- PASSED Y12 N7 E1
- EFFECTIVE DATE PASSED Y16 N3 E1
- DUNCAN NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 14, 1995 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/14/95
- HELD TO 3/15/95 CAL FOR SECOND READING
On March 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 2DNP 1AM SAME TITLE
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (REV)
- COSPONSOR: PEARCE
On February 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- FINANCE
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor