+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (38)
On May 10, 2003 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/9 CHAPTER 18 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/7/03
On April 23, 2003 in the Senate:
- 8:30 AM 4/23/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 17, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/17/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 83
- PASSED Y30 E10
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 83
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- STA RPT 6DP
- DP: SEATON, HOLM, LYNN, DAHLSTROM,
- BERKOWITZ, WEYHRAUCH
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On April 4, 2003 in the House:
- TRA RPT 7DP
- DP: OGG, KOOKESH, KAPSNER, KOHRING,
- FATE, HOLM, MASEK
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): OGG
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On March 18, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 83
- PASSED Y18 N- E1 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 83
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- STA RPT 4DP
- DP: STEVENS G, HOFFMAN, DYSON, COWDERY
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/18/2003
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- TRA RPT 4DP
- DP: COWDERY, OLSON, THERRIAULT,
- LINCOLN
- FN1: ZERO(DOT)
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- TRA, STA