+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (54)
On October 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- 2:50 PM 7/31/17 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 8/2 CHAPTER 19 SLA 17
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/31/17
On May 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N- E3
On May 17, 2017 in the House:
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y26 N11 E1 A2
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: CSSB 83(HSS) AM H
On May 16, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 83(HSS)
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR ALL AMS UC
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y19 N19 E1 A1
- AM NO 2 OFFERED
- BEFORE HOUSE WITH AM NO 2 PENDING
- AM 1 TO AM 2 ADOPTED Y24 N15 E1
- AM NO 2 AS AM ADOPTED Y37 N2 E1
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y29 N10 E1
- CHENAULT NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On May 15, 2017 in the House:
- NOT TAKEN UP 5/15 - ON 5/16 CALENDAR
On May 13, 2017 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/13/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/15 CALENDAR
On May 1, 2017 in the House:
- FIN RPT 4DP 3NR 1AM
- DP: GARA, GUTTENBERG, SEATON, FOSTER
- NR: WILSON, ORTIZ, TILTON
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On April 16, 2017 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On April 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/15/2017
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- HSS CS ADOPTED UC
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 83(HSS)
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 83(HSS)
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT CS(HSS) 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, VON IMHOF, HUGHES, MICCICHE
- NR: OLSON
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- HSS RPT CS 1DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- NR: WILSON, GIESSEL
- DP: BEGICH
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
On March 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HSS, FIN
- FN1: ZERO(DHS)
- FN2: ZERO(REV)
- GOVERNOR'S TRANSMITTAL LETTER
+ − Amendments (3)
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF THE GOVERNOR
Type:
Primary Sponsor