+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (46)
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- 9:27 AM 6/21/13 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/26 CHAPTER 55 SLA 13
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 83(FIN)
- PASSED Y38 E2
On April 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GIESSEL, MEYER
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 83(FIN)
On April 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 14, 2013 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): MUNOZ, HOLMES, TARR, LEDOUX
On April 13, 2013 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/14 CALENDAR
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/13/2013
On April 12, 2013 in the House:
- DP: HOLMES, MUNOZ, THOMPSON, EDGMON, T.WILSON, GARA, COSTELLO, STOLTZE,
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) NT 9DP 1NR 1AM
- TITLE CHANGE: HCR 13
- AUSTERMAN
- AM: KAWASAKI
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- NR: NEUMAN
On April 2, 2013 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- MCGUIRE NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 83(FIN)
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 83(FIN)
On March 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/1 CALENDAR
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/29/2013
On March 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- FN1: INDETERMINATE(REV)
- NR: DUNLEAVY, OLSON
- DP: MEYER, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, FAIRCLOUGH
- FIN RPT CS 4DP 2NR NEW TITLE
On March 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS