+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (63)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN4: (DPS)
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
On October 5, 2022 in the Senate:
- LEG FINANCE APPROPRIATION MESSAGE 8/10/22
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW SEE CHAPTER
- SIGNED INTO LAW 6/29 CHAPTER 16 SLA 22
- 2:45 P.M. 6/23/22 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
On October 5, 2022 in the House:
- FN(S) ATTACHED TO APPROP. BILL HB 281
On May 9, 2022 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y18 N- E1 A1
- CONCUR MESSAGE READ AND TAKEN UP
On May 5, 2022 in the House:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING Y34 N2 E4
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/5/2022
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- FIN HCS ADOPTED UC
- AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): JOSEPHSON, SCHRAGE, DRUMMOND, WOOL, SPOHNHOLZ, TARR, CRONK,
- READ THE THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 81(FIN)
- PASSED Y34 N2 E4
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CLAMAN, PATKOTAK, HANNAN, RASMUSSEN, STUTES, STORY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: HCS CSSB 81(FIN)
On May 4, 2022 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KAUFMAN
On April 29, 2022 in the House:
- FN4: (DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: CARPENTER
- DP: ORTIZ, EDGMON, LEBON, THOMPSON, JOHNSON, WOOL, JOSEPHSON, MERRICK, FOSTER
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 9DP 1NR
On April 25, 2022 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): FOSTER, ZULKOSKY
On April 20, 2022 in the Senate:
- VERSION: CSSB 81(CRA)
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- KAWASAKI, MICCICHE
- COSPONSOR(S): BEGICH, WIELECHOWSKI, KIEHL, STEDMAN, BISHOP, STEVENS, HOFFMAN
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 81(CRA)
On April 19, 2022 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/20 CAL
- CRA CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/19/2022
On April 11, 2022 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): REVAK
On March 25, 2022 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MYERS, HOLLAND, SHOWER
On March 23, 2022 in the Senate:
- DP: STEDMAN, BISHOP, HOFFMAN, WIELECHOWSKI, OLSON, VON IMHOF
- FIN RPT CS(CRA) 6DP 1NR SAME TITLE
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- NR: WILSON
- FN4: (DPS)
On February 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- FN4: (DPS)
- FN3: ZERO(DPS)
- AM: SHOWER, REINBOLD, HOLLAND, KAWASAKI
- STA RPT CS(CRA) 4AM SAME TITLE
On February 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- STA WAIVED PUBLIC HEARING NOTICE, RULE 23
On May 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- FN2: (DPS)
- FN1: (DPS)
- DP: GRAY-JACKSON, MYERS
- NR: HUGHES, WILSON
- CRA RPT CS 2DP 2NR SAME TITLE
On February 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): GRAY-JACKSON
- CRA, STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Amendment
AM 1
AM NO 1 OFFERED AND WITHDRAWN
+ − Sponsors (31)
Type:
Primary Sponsor