+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (27)
On May 2, 1996 in the House:
- WTR REFERRAL ADDED
On April 29, 1995 in the House:
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DPS) 3/3/95
- NR: JAMES, OGAN, ROBINSON, IVAN
- DNP: WILLIS
- STA RPT 1DNP 4NR
- REFERRED TO FINANCE
On April 12, 1995 in the House:
- STATE AFFAIRS, FINANCE
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 11, 1995 in the Senate:
- AM 1 TO LETTER OF INTENT ADPTD UNAN CON
- LETTER OF INTENT OFFERED BY HOFFMAN
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
- (S) ADOPTED LETTER OF INTENT AS AMENDED
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y14 N5 E1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On April 10, 1995 in the Senate:
- KELLY NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y15 N5
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 80(FIN)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- FIN CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/10/95
On March 30, 1995 in the Senate:
- PREVIOUS ZERO FN (DPS)
- FIN RPT CS 2DP 4NR 1AM SAME TITLE
On March 3, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (DPS)
- STA RPT 1DP 4NR
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- STA, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor