+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (30)
On February 10, 2020 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KNOPP, KOPP
On January 21, 2020 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): RASMUSSEN
On May 3, 2019 in the House:
- REFERRED TO STATE AFFAIRS
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 80 AM
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- PASSED Y15 N4 E1
- TAKEN FROM TABLE UC
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y5 N14 A1
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AMS 1 & 2 UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 80
- AM NO 2 ADOPTED Y10 N9 A1
- ...CHANGES TITLE OF LEGISLATION
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- TABLED Y13 N6 A1
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 4/30 CALENDAR
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/29/2019
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT 3DP 1NR
- DP: HUGHES, MICCICHE, REINBOLD
- NR: KIEHL
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
On April 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(GOV)
- DNP: KAWASAKI
- DP: MICCICHE, COGHILL
- NR: SHOWER, REINBOLD
- STA RPT 2DP 1DNP 2NR
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- STA, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS