+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (16)
On March 17, 2023 in the House:
- REFERRED TO JUDICIARY
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 15, 2023 in the Senate:
- VERSION: SB 80
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y19 N- E1
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 80
On March 13, 2023 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 3/15 CAL
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/13/23
On March 8, 2023 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- DP: CLAMAN, GIESSEL, KAUFMAN, KIEHL
- JUD RPT 4DP
On February 24, 2023 in the Senate:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsor
SENATE RULES BY REQUEST OF LEGISLATIVE COUNCIL
Type:
Primary Sponsor