+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (42)
On August 20, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 10/8/03
- 10:25 AM 7/8/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
- SIGNED INTO LAW 7/10 CHAPTER 141 SLA 03
On May 20, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN, MCGUIRE
- VERSION: CSSB 8(JUD)
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y36 E2 A2
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- KERTTULA NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- PASSED Y36 E2 A2
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 8(JUD)
On May 19, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/19/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING 5/20 CALENDAR
On May 18, 2003 in the House:
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
- NR: SAMUELS, HOLM, OGG
- DP: GARA, GRUENBERG, MCGUIRE;
- JUD RPT 3DP 3NR
On May 16, 2003 in the House:
- JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On May 15, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/15/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 8(JUD)
- COSPONSOR(S): LINCOLN, FRENCH, BUNDE,
- COWDERY, ELTON, ELLIS
- VERSION: CSSB 8(JUD)
- PASSED Y20 N-
On May 7, 2003 in the Senate:
- DP: SEEKINS, FRENCH, ELLIS;
- JUD RPT CS 3DP 2NR SAME TITLE
- NR: THERRIAULT, OGAN
- FN2: ZERO(ADM)
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- NR: GUESS, WILKEN
- AM: DYSON; DP: GREEN, DAVIS;
- HES RPT 2DP 2NR 1AM
On January 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES, JUD
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- PREFILE RELEASED 1/10/03
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor