+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (43)
On May 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 8/3/03
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/5 CHAPTER 17 SLA 03
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- MANIFEST ERROR(S)
- 12:45PM 4/17/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 11, 2003 in the House:
- PASSED Y37 E3
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/11/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOV NEXT
- VERSION: SB 79
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): CROFT, ROKEBERG,
- STOLTZE, DAHLSTROM
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 79
On April 8, 2003 in the House:
- FN1: (CED)
- WILLIAMS; NR: STOLTZE
- CHENAULT, WHITAKER, FOSTER, HARRIS,
- DP: MEYER, HAWKER, CROFT, JOULE,
- FIN RPT 9DP 1NR
On March 31, 2003 in the House:
- DP: GUTTENBERG, KERTTULA, MASEK,
- RES RPT 8DP
- MORGAN, HEINZE, GATTO, LYNN, FATE
- FN1: (CED)
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): KERTTULA, LYNN
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On March 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/17/2003
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 79
- PASSED Y17 N- E2 A1
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 79
On March 13, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- BUNDE, STEVENS B, OLSON
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, HOFFMAN,
- FIN RPT 7DP
On March 6, 2003 in the Senate:
- FN1: (CED)
- DYSON, LINCOLN, ELTON
- DP: OGAN, STEVENS B, SEEKINS, WAGONER,
- RES RPT 7DP
On February 26, 2003 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): FRENCH
On February 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- RES, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS