+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (33)
On June 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/23/95
- SIGNED INTO LAW 5/25 CHAPTER 43 SLA 95
On May 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- 11:07 AM 5/9/95 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On May 7, 1995 in the House:
- RETURN TO (S), TRANSMIT TO GOVERNOR NEXT
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y37 E2 A1
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 79(CRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- RULES TO CALENDAR 5/07/95
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On May 6, 1995 in the House:
- 2 SEN ZERO FNS (DCRA, DNR) 4/20/95
- NR: VEZEY, GREEN
- DP: PORTER, BUNDE, TOOHEY
- JUD RPT 3DP 2NR
On April 28, 1995 in the House:
- JUDICIARY
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
On April 27, 1995 in the Senate:
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y20 N-
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On April 26, 1995 in the Senate:
- HELD ON RECONSIDERATION TO 4/27 CALENDAR
- RECON TAKEN UP - IN THIRD READING
On April 25, 1995 in the Senate:
- HALFORD NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- COURT RULE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- PASSED Y20 N-
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 79(CRA)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- CRA CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/25/95
On April 20, 1995 in the Senate:
- ZERO FNS (DNR, DCRA)
- CRA RPT CS 1DP 2NR NEW TITLE
On February 9, 1995 in the Senate:
- CRA
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor