+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On April 18, 2018 in the House:
- FN7: (H.FIN/REV)(CORRECTED)
On April 17, 2018 in the House:
- FN5: ZERO(LAW)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON
- FIN RPT HCS(FIN) 4DP 4DNP 3NR
- DNP: KAWASAKI, PRUITT, GUTTENBERG, GRENN
- NR: GARA, ORTIZ, TILTON
- DP: WILSON, THOMPSON, SEATON, FOSTER
- FN6: INDETERMINATE(H.FIN/EED)
- FN7: (H.FIN/REV)
- FN8: (H.FIN/REV)
- FN9: (REV)
- REFERRED TO RULES
On April 15, 2017 in the House:
- FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
On April 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- FN4: (S.FIN/REV)
- FIN RPT CS 5DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: HOFFMAN, MACKINNON, BISHOP, HUGHES, MICCICHE
- NR: OLSON
- AM: VON IMHOF
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN3: (REV)
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UC
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/14/2017
- FIN CS ADOPTED UC
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 78(FIN)
- PASSED Y19 N1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: CSSB 78(FIN)
- READ THE SECOND TIME
On March 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- DP: HUGHES
- EDC RPT CS 1DP 3NR SAME TITLE
- FN3: (REV)
- NR: BEGICH, GIESSEL, COGHILL
- FN1: ZERO(LAW)
- FN2: (REV)
On March 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): MEYER, DUNLEAVY, VON IMHOF, STEVENS, HUGHES, MICCICHE
- EDC, FIN
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor