+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (51)
On April 17, 2003 in the Senate:
- SIGNED INTO LAW 4/16 CHAPTER 9 SLA 03
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) OF LAW 4/17/03
On April 4, 2003 in the Senate:
- 8:50 AM 4/4/03 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On March 31, 2003 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y17 N- E3
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
On March 28, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/28/2003
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 78
- RETURN TO SECOND FOR AM 1 UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AUTOMATICALLY IN THIRD READING
- PASSED Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- DAHLSTROM NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
- RECON TAKEN UP SAME DAY UNAN CONSENT
- PASSED ON RECONSIDERATION Y38 E1 A1
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): SAMUELS, ANDERSON,
- MEYER, HEINZE
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
- VERSION: SB 78 AM H
On March 24, 2003 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/24/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- RETURNED TO RLS COMMITTEE
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): WILSON
On March 19, 2003 in the House:
- FIN RPT 3DP 4NR 1AM
- DP: MEYER, FOSTER, WILLIAMS;
- NR: HAWKER, STOLTZE, CHENAULT, HARRIS;
- AM: CROFT
- FN1: (HSS)
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): LYNN
On March 7, 2003 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- FIN
On March 5, 2003 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 3/5/2003
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- AM NO 1 FAILED Y8 N12
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME SB 78
- PASSED Y20 N-
- EFFECTIVE DATE(S) SAME AS PASSAGE
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
- VERSION: SB 78
On March 3, 2003 in the Senate:
- FIN RPT 4DP 2NR
- DP: GREEN, WILKEN, TAYLOR, STEVENS B;
- NR: HOFFMAN, OLSON
- FN1: (HSS)
On February 28, 2003 in the Senate:
- HES RPT 3DP 1NR 1AM
- DP: DYSON, WILKEN, GREEN;
- NR: GUESS; AM: DAVIS
- FN1: (HSS)
On February 21, 2003 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRALS
- HES, FIN
+ − Amendments (2)
+ − Sponsors (16)
Type:
Primary Sponsor