+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (39)
On May 12, 1999 in the Senate:
- LAW W/O GOV SIGNATURE 5/11 CHAP 17 SLA99
- EFFECTIVE DATE OF LAW 8/9/99
On April 23, 1999 in the Senate:
- 2:55 PM 4/23/99 TRANSMITTED TO GOVERNOR
On April 21, 1999 in the Senate:
- CONCUR AM OF (H) Y20 N-
On April 20, 1999 in the House:
- RULES TO CALENDAR 4/20/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD HCS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- AM NO 1 ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THIRD TIME HCS CSSB 77(JUD) AM H
- PASSED Y33 E7
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): GREEN, BRICE, CROFT,
- SMALLEY
- TRANSMITTED TO (S) AS AMENDED
On April 12, 1999 in the House:
- JUD RPT HCS(JUD) 5DP 1NR
- DP: CROFT, MURKOWSKI, GREEN, ROKEBERG,
- KOTT; NR: KERTTULA
- SENATE ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COURT) 3/16/99
On April 7, 1999 in the House:
- CROSS SPONSOR(S): DYSON
On March 29, 1999 in the House:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD
On March 26, 1999 in the Senate:
- RECONSIDERATION NOT TAKEN UP
- TRANSMITTED TO (H)
On March 25, 1999 in the Senate:
- RULES TO CALENDAR AND 1 OR 3/25/99
- READ THE SECOND TIME
- JUD CS ADOPTED UNAN CONSENT
- ADVANCED TO THIRD READING UNAN CONSENT
- READ THE THIRD TIME CSSB 77(JUD)
- PASSED Y15 N5
- ELLIS NOTICE OF RECONSIDERATION
On March 22, 1999 in the Senate:
- FIN REFERRAL WAIVED
On March 16, 1999 in the Senate:
- JUD RPT CS 4DP NEW TITLE
- DP: TAYLOR, TORGERSON, DONLEY, HALFORD
- ZERO FISCAL NOTE (COURT)
On March 15, 1999 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): DONLEY, TAYLOR, HALFORD,
- GREEN, MILLER
On February 24, 1999 in the Senate:
- COSPONSOR(S): WARD
On February 18, 1999 in the Senate:
- READ THE FIRST TIME - REFERRAL(S)
- JUD, FIN
+ − Amendment
+ − Sponsors (12)
KELLY PETE
Type:
Primary Sponsor